EP0007936 - A DEVICE FOR ABSORBING URINE WITH INCONTINENT PERSONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.06.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mo och Domsjö Aktiebolag Fack S-89101 Örnsköldsvik / SE | [1980/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSNER, Hans Ymervägen 56 S-182 60 Djursholm / SE | [1980/04] | Representative(s) | Forsheden, Jarl Ragnar, et al L.A. Groth & Co. AB Västmannagatan 43 113 25 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/04] | Forsheden, Jarl Ragnar, et al L.A. Groth & Co. AB Västmannagatan 43 S-113 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 78900020.5 | 21.06.1978 | [1980/04] | WO1978SE00005 | Priority number, date | SE19770007327 | 23.06.1977 Original published format: SE 7707327 | [1980/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900008 | Date: | 11.01.1979 | [1979/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0007936 | Date: | 20.02.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/04] | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, A61G9/00 | [1980/04] | CPC: |
A61F13/512 (EP);
A61F13/665 (EP);
A61F5/4401 (EP);
A61F13/47 (EP);
A61F2013/51186 (EP);
A61F2013/530481 (EP);
A61F2013/53051 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1980/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABSORBIERUNG VON URIN FÜR AN INKONTINENZ LEIDENDE PERSONEN | [1980/04] | English: | A DEVICE FOR ABSORBING URINE WITH INCONTINENT PERSONS | [1980/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ABSORBANT L'URINE POUR LES PERSONNES SOUFFRANT D'INCONTINENCE | [1980/04] | File destroyed: | 06.06.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1979 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1979 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 04.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/34] | 11.05.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2024341 ; | [A]DE523140 ; | [A]FR790797 ; | [A]US2468445 |