EP0006948 - ROD DESIGNED TO BE ANCHORED IN THE ROOT-CANAL OF A TOOTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1981 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPANG, Herbert Hauptstrasse 12 CH-3250 Lyss / CH | [1980/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/02] | Representative(s) | Seehof, Michel, et al Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Seehof, Michel, et al Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [1980/02] | Seehof, Michel, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 CH-3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 78900268.0 | 06.11.1978 | [1980/02] | WO1978CH00037 | Priority number, date | CH19770013691 | 08.11.1977 Original published format: CH 1369177 | [1980/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900275 | Date: | 17.05.1979 | [1979/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006948 | Date: | 23.01.1980 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/02] | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/30 | [1980/02] | CPC: |
A61C13/30 (EP);
A61C5/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU, SE [1980/02] | Title | German: | ZAHNWURZEL-KANALSTIFT | [1980/02] | English: | ROD DESIGNED TO BE ANCHORED IN THE ROOT-CANAL OF A TOOTH | [1980/02] | French: | TIGE DESTINEE A ETRE ANCREE DANS LE CANAL RADICULAIRE D'UNE DENT | [1980/02] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1979 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1979 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 02.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/07] | 29.10.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE865791 [ ] (FRICO G M B H GOLD UND SILBER); | DE845243 [ ] (GERLACH HANS DR, et al); | FR894771 [ ]; | CH291668 [ ] (ANTAEOS WERKE GMBH [DE]); | DE929021 [ ] (FRICO G M B H GOLD UND SILBER); | CH291665 [ ] (RUETZ JOSEPH [CH]); | US2453696 [ ] (PHILLIPS BROOKS); | FR91966E [ ]; | GB1129143 [ ] (SHAWTREN LTD) |