EP0008314 - COOLED COMPONENTS FOR FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMES BROWN & SONS LIMITED Longlands Road Longlands Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS4 2JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/05] | For all designated states JAMES BROWN & SONS LIMITED Longlands Road Longlands Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS4 2JJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDMER, Colin, Frederick 67 Levenside Stokesley, Middlesbrough Cleveland / GB | [1980/05] | Representative(s) | Gura, Henry Alan, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [1980/05] | Application number, filing date | 78900318.3 | 20.12.1978 | [1980/05] | WO1978GB00055 | Priority number, date | GB19770053817 | 23.12.1977 Original published format: GB 5381777 | [1980/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900431 | Date: | 12.07.1979 | [1979/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0008314 | Date: | 05.03.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0008314 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/10, C21B7/16 | [1980/05] | CPC: |
C21B7/10 (EP);
C21B7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LU [1982/19] |
Former [1980/11] | DE, FR, GB, LU, SE | ||
Former [1980/05] | CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, SE | Title | German: | KÜHLKOMPONENTEN FÜR ÖFEN | [1980/05] | English: | COOLED COMPONENTS FOR FURNACES | [1980/05] | French: | COMPOSANTS REFROIDIS POUR FOURNEAUX | [1980/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1979 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1979 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 16.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1982 | [1999/52] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2601727 ; | DE148071 [ ]; | US1673053 [ ] |