EP0003961 - Process for preparing high molecular weight catalyst free polyethylene terephthalate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelley, Mellis Michael 972 Jason Avenue Akron Ohio 44314 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1980/01] | Zewen, Arthur 4 Place Winston-Churchill B.P. 447 Luxembourg-Ville / LU | ||
Former [1980/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1980/01] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 79100285.0 | 31.01.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780877455 | 13.02.1978 Original published format: US 877455 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003961 | Date: | 19.09.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003961 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/26 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
C08G63/80 (EP,US);
C08G63/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von katalysatorfreiem hochmolekularem Polyäthylenterephthalat | English: | Process for preparing high molecular weight catalyst free polyethylene terephthalate | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polytéréphtalate d'éthylèneglycol de poids moléculaire élevé exempt de catalyseur | Examination procedure | 19.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 10.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.02.1979 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of applicant | 05.10.1979 | Resumption of proceedings | 23.02.1979 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of applicant | Documents cited: | Search | FR1368576 [ ] (ONDERZOEKINGS INST RES); | FR1561316 [ ]; | FR1564495 [ ]; | FR2061624 [ ] (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER) |