EP0003811 - Method and plant for the heating and/or conditioning of rooms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1981 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ditta FERRARI CLAUDIO di LUIGI FERRARI & C. S.p.A. 1120/A, VIA Vignolese 41010 Collegarola (Modena) / IT | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roli, Antonio 1070 Via Vignolese I-41100 Modena / IT | 02 /
Sola, Claudio 19, Via Valdrighi I-41100 Modena / IT | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Gardi, Giuliano Gardipatent Palazzo Prora Via Giardini, 605 41100 Modena / IT | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100462.5 | 16.02.1979 | Priority number, date | IT19780040027 | 24.02.1978 Original published format: IT 4002778 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0003811 | Date: | 05.09.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0003811 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00, E06B7/28, F24D5/02 | CPC: |
F24F1/00 (EP);
F24D13/026 (EP);
F24D5/02 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Raumheizung und/oder Raumklimatisierung | English: | Method and plant for the heating and/or conditioning of rooms | French: | Procédé et installation de chauffage et/ou de conditionnement de pièces | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 25.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 29.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1981/35] | 25.05.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1553507 [ ] (CAMPBELL HARRY E); | US1977248 [ ] (SPACE JAMES A); | US3002078 [ ] (PROCTER JAMES C); | BE717626 [ ]; | DE1604178 [ ] (GROSS ERNST); | FR2085473 [ ] (VEY JEAN); | FR2224633 [ ] (CALMETTES CLAUDE [FR]) |