EP0004014 - Method and solution for the development of exposed light-sensitive reproduction layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palmer, Roland, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Freseniusstrasse 53 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100566.3 | 26.02.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782809774 | 07.03.1978 Original published format: DE 2809774 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004014 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004014 | Date: | 19.09.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004014 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/08, G03C5/00 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
G03F7/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Entwicklerlösung zum Entwickeln von belichteten lichtempfindlichen Kopierschichten | English: | Method and solution for the development of exposed light-sensitive reproduction layers | French: | Procédé et solution de développement de couches de reproduction photosensibles exposées | Examination procedure | 18.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 09.12.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2624074 (OCE VAN DER GRINTEN NV); | [AD]DE2530502 (HOECHST CO AMERICAN); | [A]DE2364631 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]FR1551548 ; | [A]DE2637768 (HOECHST AG); | [PD]DE2739774 (HOECHST AG); | [P]FR2366598 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |