EP0005151 - Hydraulic system including a margin valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/07] | Margin valve | ||
[1984/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.1984 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Tractor Co. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629 / US | ||
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states Caterpillar Tractor Co. 100 N. E. Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Howard Leighton 608 Bethel Drive Joliet Illinois 60435 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/07] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79100593.7 | 28.02.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780901409 | 01.05.1978 Original published format: US 901409 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0005151 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0005151 | Date: | 14.11.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005151 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/05, G05D16/00 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
F15B11/17 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20538 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20553 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20584 (EP,US);
F15B2211/253 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7052 (EP,US);
F15B2211/76 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2544 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2703 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8663 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hydraulisches System mit einem Anforderungsgrenzventil | [1984/07] | English: | Hydraulic system including a margin valve | [1984/07] | French: | Système hydraulique avec une soupape de marge | [1984/07] |
Former [1984/07] | Anforderungsgrenzventil | ||
Former [1984/07] | Margin valve | ||
Former [1984/07] | Soupape de marge | Examination procedure | 22.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 24.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 02.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.1982 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.1982 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.1982 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.02.1984 | NL | 15.02.1984 | SE | 15.02.1984 | LU | 29.02.1984 | [1999/52] |
Former [1985/23] | CH | 15.02.1984 | |
NL | 15.02.1984 | ||
SE | 15.02.1984 | ||
Former [1984/33] | CH | 15.02.1984 | |
SE | 15.02.1984 | ||
Former [1984/29] | CH | 15.02.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | US3945764 [ ] (MARIETTA WALTER E); | US3987622 [ ] (JOHNSON HOWARD L); | US3987623 [ ] (BIANCHETTA DONALD L) |