EP0004877 - A process for thermally polymerizing cyclic phosphazenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/19] | Catalysis of phosphazene cyclics to polymer, using Ziegler type catalysts | ||
[1982/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron, Ohio 44317 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snyder, Dennis LaVerne Route No. 1 Atwood Glenns Mineral City Ohio 44656 / US | 02 /
Kang, Jung Wong 6150 Terrace Hills Drive Clinton Ohio 44216 / US | 03 /
Fieldhouse, John William 2454 Sunny Brook Road Mogadore Ohio 44260 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Krause, Dieter, et al Tillmannsweg 4 14109 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | Krause, Dieter, et al Tillmannsweg 4 D-14109 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 79100883.2 | 23.03.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780898007 | 20.04.1978 Original published format: US 898007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004877 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004877 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08G79/02 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
C01B21/098 (EP);
C01B21/0986 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur thermischen Polymerisation von cyclischen Phosphazenen | [1982/19] | English: | A process for thermally polymerizing cyclic phosphazenes | [1982/19] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation thermique de phosphazènes cycliques | [1982/19] |
Former [1982/19] | Verfahren zur katalytischen Polymerisation von cyclischen Phosphazenen mittels Ziegler-Katalysatoren | ||
Former [1982/19] | Catalysis of phosphazene cyclics to polymer, using Ziegler type catalysts | ||
Former [1982/19] | Procédé de polymérisation catalytique de phosphazènes cycliques au moyen de catalyseurs du type Ziegler | Examination procedure | 23.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 26.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 28.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1506834 [ ]; | DE2816227 [ ]; | DE2754245 [ ]; | GB1506835 [ ] |