EP0004652 - Process for the preparation of iron oxide for magnetic signal registration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/42] | Iron oxide for magnetic signal registration and method for its preparation | ||
[1984/42] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.07.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1985 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.09.1985 [1985/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buxbaum, Gunter, Dr. Holzapfelweg 2 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Pflugmacher, Ingo, Dr. Asternstrasse 16 D-4005 Meerbusch 3 / DE | 03 /
Hund, Franz, Dr. Scheiblerstrasse 89 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 04 /
Hahnkamm, Volker, Dr. Dörperhofstrasse 14 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 05 /
Woditsch, Peter, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 83 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100984.8 | 31.03.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782815712 | 12.04.1978 Original published format: DE 2815712 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004652 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004652 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004652 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0004652 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/11, G11B5/70, C09C1/24, C01G49/06 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
G11B5/70657 (EP,US);
G11B5/70663 (EP,US);
G11B5/70668 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1981/42] | H01F1/11, C09C1/24, C01G49/06, // G11B5/70 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Eisenoxiden zur magnetischen Signalaufzeichnung | [1984/42] | English: | Process for the preparation of iron oxide for magnetic signal registration | [1984/42] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de l'oxyde de fer pour l'enregistrement magnétique de signaux | [1984/42] |
Former [1981/42] | Eisenoxide zur magnetischen Signalaufzeichnung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [1981/42] | Iron oxide for magnetic signal registration and method for its preparation | ||
Former [1981/42] | Oxyde de fer pour l'enregistrement magnétique de signaux et méthode pour sa préparation | Examination procedure | 31.03.1979 | Examination requested | 07.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.1982
09.08.1982
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.1982
09.08.1982
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 17.09.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.12.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.01.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1983 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.06.1985 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1252646 [ ]; | US3382174 [ ] (FRANZ HUND); | FR2197818 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]); | DE2507420 [ ] (BAYER AG) |