EP0005173 - Process and device for discharging molten phosphorus pentasulphide from a reactor. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Johannes, Dr. Gernotstrasse 5 D-5030 Hürth-Hermülheim / DE | 02 /
Mainzer, Franz Bergstrasse 81 D-5030 Hürth / DE | 03 /
Reichert, Günter Weierstrasse 26 D-5303 Bornheim-Merten / DE | 04 /
Niermann, Hermann, Dr. Am Wachberg 34 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79100999.6 | 31.03.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782818422 | 27.04.1978 Original published format: DE 2818422 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005173 | Date: | 14.11.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/14 | CPC: |
C01B25/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Austragen von geschmolzenem Phosphorpentasulfid aus einem Reaktor | English: | Process and device for discharging molten phosphorus pentasulphide from a reactor. | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'évacuation de pentasulfure de phosphore fondu d'un réacteur | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 19.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 16.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1982/14] | 21.01.1982 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1982/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2569128 [ ] (JONES OTHA C); | DE1195282 [ ] (KNAPSACK AG) | [ ] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED CHEMISTRY OF THE USSR, Band 51, Nr. 4, Teil 2, April 1978, New York, YSA, I.S. NIKANDROV et al.: "Kinetics of interaction of sulfur and phosphorus melts"Seiten 892-894. | [ ] - CHEMIE INGENIEUR TECHNIK, Juli 1965 Weinheim, Bergstr. DR. J. CREMER: "Zur grosstechnischen Herstellung und Anwendung von Phosphorpentasulfid"Seiten 705-709. |