EP0004679 - Process for manufacturing a wheel of light metal for air-tyred motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/03] | Wheel of light metal, especially aluminium or its alloys, for air-tyred motor vehicles, and process for manufacturing the wheel | ||
[1982/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ardal og Sunndal Verk a.s. Sörkedalsveien 6 Oslo 3 / NO | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trondsen, Kristian Frederik Skolegt. 32 3080 Holmestrand / NO | 02 /
Petersen, Vagn Solasveien 28 3080 Holmestrand / NO | 03 /
Berg, Otto Undelstadveien 84c 1380 Asker / NO | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Zellentin, Rüdiger, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [2009/32] |
Former [1982/03] | Zellentin, Rüdiger, Dr., et al Zweibrückenstrasse 15 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101098.6 | 10.04.1979 | Priority number, date | NO19780001248 | 10.04.1978 Original published format: NO 781248 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004679 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004679 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/02, B21D53/26 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
B21K1/32 (EP);
B21D53/26 (EP);
B60B25/002 (EP);
B60B3/004 (EP);
B60B3/007 (EP);
B60B3/06 (EP);
B60B3/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1982/03] | B60B3/08, B21D53/26 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1980/01] |
Former [N/P] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Rades aus Leichtmetall für luftbereifte Kraftfahrzeuge | [1982/03] | English: | Process for manufacturing a wheel of light metal for air-tyred motor vehicles | [1982/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une roue en métal léger pour véhicules automoteurs à pneumatiques | [1982/03] |
Former [1982/03] | Rad für luftbereifte Kraftfahrzeuge aus Leichtmetall, insbesondere Aluminium oder dessen Legierungen, sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung des Rades | ||
Former [1982/03] | Wheel of light metal, especially aluminium or its alloys, for air-tyred motor vehicles, and process for manufacturing the wheel | ||
Former [1982/03] | Roue en métal léger, en particulier en aluminium ou ses alliages, pour véhicules automoteurs à pneumatiques, et procédé de fabrication de la roue | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1979 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, IT, LU | 22.08.1979 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 10.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE132546 [ ]; | BE338591 [ ]; | US1518369 [ ] (VANDER STOLP JOHN); | US1525479 [ ] (JOHN WEBER); | FR599883 [ ] (MANUF FR DE JANTES METALLIQUES); | FR618609 [ ] (ROUES DETACHABLES RUDGE WHITWO); | FR1002005 [ ] (MICHELIN CAOUTCHOUC); | FR2125544 [ ] (MAGNESIUM ELEKTRON LTD); | US3719980 [ ] (VAN BUSSEL P); | US3842475 [ ] (CLASPER T, et al); | FR2248946 [ ] (MOTOR WHEEL CORP [US]) |