EP0004949 - 4-Aza-17-substituted-5-alpha-androstan-3-one, their A and D homo analogs, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. (a New Jersey corp.) 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, N.J. 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnston, David Bruce Randolph 53 Round Top Road Warren, New Jersey 07060 / US | 02 /
Reinhold, Donald Floyd 564 Park Avenue North Plainfield, New Jersey 07060 / US | 03 /
Rasmusson, Gary Henry 155 Park Place Watchung, New Jersey 07060 / US | 04 /
Utne, Torleif 5, Mimi Lane Warren, New Jersey 07060 / US | 05 /
Arth, Glen Edward - deceased Executrix: Rose B. Arth 104 Oak Lane Cranford, New Jersey 07016 / US | 06 /
Jobson, Ronald Bradford 25 Sheridan Avenue East Brunswick, New Jersey 08816 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101131.5 | 12.04.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780896118 | 13.04.1978 Original published format: US 896118 | US19780896120 | 13.04.1978 Original published format: US 896120 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004949 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004949 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07J73/00, C07J71/00, A61K31/435, A61K31/55, // C07J3/00, C07J11/00, C07J17/00, C07J33/00, C07J41/00, C07J43/00, C07C103/737 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
C07J3/005 (EP);
C07J11/00 (EP);
C07J17/00 (EP);
C07J33/007 (EP);
C07J41/0016 (EP);
C07J41/0066 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | In 17-Stellung substituierte 4-Aza-5-alpha-androstan-3-one, ihre A- und D-homo Analogen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zubereitungen die sie enthalten | English: | 4-Aza-17-substituted-5-alpha-androstan-3-one, their A and D homo analogs, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | French: | 4-Aza-5-alpha-androstanes 3-one substitués en position 17, leurs A- et D-homo analogues, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | Examination procedure | 25.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 13.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2897202 [ ] | [ ] - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES vol. 63, no. 4, April 1974 Washington DC (USA) NORMAN J. DOORENBOS et al.: "Synthesis and evaluation of antimicrobial properties of amidinoazaandrostanes and guanidinoazaandrostanes" pages 620-622. * Whole article * |