EP0005225 - Apparatus for extracting moisture from and for reheating steam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEIN INDUSTRIE Société anonyme dite: 19-21, Avenue Morane Saulnier B.P. 74 F-78141 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bessouat, Roger 15, rue Ribera F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Marjollet, Jacques 37, Quai de Valmy F-75010 Paris / FR | 03 /
Palacio, Gérard 11 Boulevard de l'Orangerie F-95160 Montmorency / FR | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/15] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101215.6 | 23.04.1979 | Priority number, date | FR19780012634 | 28.04.1978 Original published format: FR 7812634 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005225 | Date: | 14.11.1979 | Language: | FR | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005225 | Date: | 15.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/26, F22G3/00 | [1981/15] | CPC: |
F22B37/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Trocknen und Überhitzen von Dampf | English: | Apparatus for extracting moisture from and for reheating steam | French: | Dispositif de séchage et de surchauffe de vapeur | Examination procedure | 25.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 25.08.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1980 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1980 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1980 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2019188 [ ] (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | FR2224031 [ ] (STEIN INDUSTRIE [FR]); | FR2327487 [ ] (FIVES CAIL BABCOCK [FR]) |