EP0005477 - Facade covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.03.1986 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fink, Albert Dieselstrasse 16 D-7251 Hemmingen / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Str. 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/28] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Hermann-Essig-Str. 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101316.2 | 02.05.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782820500 | 11.05.1978 Original published format: DE 2820500 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005477 | Date: | 28.11.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005477 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0005477 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04F13/12 | [1981/28] | CPC: |
E04F13/0892 (EP);
E04F13/0821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Fassadenverkleidung | English: | Facade covering | French: | Revêtement de façades | Examination procedure | 13.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/16] | 28.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.1982
06.05.1982
ADMISSIBLE Profil-Vertrieb GmbH Viktoriastrasse 58 D-7560 Gaggenau / DE Opponent's representative Geitz, Heinrich Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Patentanwälte, Kriegsstrasse 234 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.1982
06.05.1982
ADMISSIBLE Profil-Vertrieb GmbH Viktoriastrasse 58 D-7560 Gaggenau / DE Opponent's representative Geitz, Heinrich, Dr.-Ing. Kaiserstrasse 156 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 25.05.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.09.1982 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.07.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1984 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.02.1986 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.05.1982 | LU | 31.05.1982 | NL | 01.12.1983 | BE | 31.05.1985 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | SE | 03.05.1982 | |
LU | 31.05.1982 | ||
GB | 02.05.1983 | ||
NL | 01.12.1983 | ||
BE | 31.05.1985 | ||
Former [1996/15] | SE | 03.05.1982 | |
GB | 02.05.1983 | ||
NL | 01.12.1983 | ||
BE | 31.05.1985 | ||
Former [1991/49] | GB | 02.05.1983 | |
NL | 01.12.1983 | ||
BE | 31.05.1985 | ||
Former [1985/23] | GB | 02.05.1983 | |
NL | 01.12.1983 | ||
Former [1984/20] | GB | 02.05.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | DE7435250U [ ]; | US2796637 [ ] (MILES LAWRENCE G); | US3236016 [ ] (KOENIGSHOF GERALD A); | DE7829730U [ ] |