EP0005760 - Straightening machine for sheets and strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malinowski, Hans Herchenbachstrasse 1 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Pielsticker, Klaus-Peter Grupellostrasse 7 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Pollmeier, Felix, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/42] | Pollmeier, Felix, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101493.9 | 16.05.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782824217 | 02.06.1978 Original published format: DE 2824217 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005760 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005760 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/02 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
B21D1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Richtmaschine für Bleche und Bänder | English: | Straightening machine for sheets and strips | French: | Machine pour le redressage de tôles et de bandes | Examination procedure | 18.01.1980 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 24.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2963071 [ ] (ALEXANDER KRYNYTZKY); | DE1234661 [ ] (HEAD WRIGHTSON & CO LTD); | US3301031 [ ] (BEARER GERALD L); | US3420082 [ ] (BEARER GERALD L); | DE2052670 [ ]; | DE1183466 [ ] (VOSS ENGINEERING COMPANY) |