EP0006545 - A set for containing and applying into a human anatomic cavity a metered quantity of doughy medical or contraceptive substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.1980 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.1981 [1981/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boschetti, Enrica 171, Via Melchiorre Gioia 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states Boschetti, Enrica 171, Via Melchiorre Gioia I-20125 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Ferraiolo, Ruggero Via Napo Torriani, 10 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Ferraiolo, Ruggero Via Napo Torriani, 10 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 79101948.2 | 15.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | IT19780022184 | 27.06.1978 Original published format: IT 2218478 | [1980/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0006545 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0006545 | Date: | 23.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
A61M31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LU, NL, SE [1980/01] | Title | German: | Applikator mit Füllung zum Einbringen einer Dosis medizinaler oder empfängnisverhütender, salbenartiger Substanz in anatomische, menschliche Körperhöhlen | [1980/01] | English: | A set for containing and applying into a human anatomic cavity a metered quantity of doughy medical or contraceptive substance | [1980/01] | French: | Ensemble pour contenir et appliquer dans une cavité anatomique humaine, une quantité dosée de substance pâteuse médicinale ou contraceptive | [1980/01] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1981/06] | 08.11.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1914754 ; | CH339320 [ ]; | GB463757 [ ]; | US2077176 [ ]; | [P]US4125113 |