EP0006615 - Process for preparing epihalohydrin enantiomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/01] | Process for preparing epihalohydrin enantiomers and intermediates | ||
[1983/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. (a New Jersey corp.) 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, N.J. 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldwin, John James 1680 Wagon Wheel Lane Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 02 /
McClure, David Earl 2307 Bramblegate Drive Hatfield, Pennsylvania 19448 / US | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79102138.9 | 27.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | US19780919590 | 27.06.1978 Original published format: US 919590 | US19780940681 | 08.09.1978 Original published format: US 940681 | [1980/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006615 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006615 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/02, C07D303/08, C07D317/20, C07D317/22, C07D317/24 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
C07D303/22 (EP);
C07D301/02 (EP);
C07D303/16 (EP);
C07D317/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epihalohydrin Enantiomeren | [1983/09] | English: | Process for preparing epihalohydrin enantiomers | [1983/09] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'énantiomères d'épihalohydrines | [1983/09] |
Former [1980/01] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epihalohydrin-Enantiomeren und Zwischenprodukte | ||
Former [1980/01] | Process for preparing epihalohydrin enantiomers and intermediates | ||
Former [1980/01] | Procédé de préparation d'énantiomères d'épihalohydrines et intermédiaires | Examination procedure | 04.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 28.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - BEILSTEINS HANDBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, 4th edition, 1st supplement, Vol. 17, 1934, SPRINGER VERLAG, Berlin * page 4 * | [ ] - BEILSTEINS HANDBUCH DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, 4th edition, 3th and 4th supplement, Vol. 19, part 2 1977, SPRINGER VERLAG, Berlin, Heidelberg, New York * page 646 * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 65, Nr. 1, July 4, 1966 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) N. NAKABAYASHI et al. "Some reactions of the glycidyl esters of sulfonic acids" column 671 D-H & Bull. Chem. Soc. Japan, Volume 39, Nr. 3, 1966 pages 413 to 417 (Eng). | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 87, Nr. 17 October 24, 1977 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) B.T. GOLDING et al. "Rapid syntheses of 3-0-benzyl-sn-glycerol and 2-0-benzylglycerol" page 652, column 1, Abstract Nr. 134 209E & Synthesis, Nr. 6, 1977, pages 423 to 424 (Eng). | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, Volume 87, Nr. 17 October 24, 1977 (COLUMBUS, OHIO, USA) B.T. GOLDING et al. "Rapid syntheses of 3-O-benzyl-sn-glycerol and 2-O-benzylglycerol" page 652, column 1, abstract Nr. 134 209E |