EP0006620 - Process for the manufacture of polypropylene moulding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.01.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1984 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.03.1984 [1984/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/16] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 80 03 20 D-65926 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kloos, Friedrich, Dr. Südring 112 D-6500 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Leugering, Hans Joachim, Dr. Kanalstrasse 3 D-8261 Burgkirchen/Alz / DE | [1980/01] | Application number, filing date | 79102154.6 | 28.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | DE19782828763 | 30.06.1978 Original published format: DE 2828763 | [1980/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006620 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006620 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/12, C08L23/06, C08L23/16 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
C08L23/12 (EP);
C08L23/142 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L23/06, C08L23/16 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [1980/01] | C08L23/00, C08L23/06, C08L23/12, C08L23/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Polypropylen-Formmasse | [1980/01] | English: | Process for the manufacture of polypropylene moulding compositions | [1980/01] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de compositions de moulage de polypropylène | [1980/01] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 06.03.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.10.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.1983
23.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Chemical Company P.O. Box 503 Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US Opponent's representative Dew, Melvyn John ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | 02
18.01.1983
23.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative van de Panne, Vitus Nicolaas Octrooibureau DSM Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | 03
21.01.1983
23.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Abt.: Patente/Lizenzen D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.1983
23.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Exxon Chemical Company P.O. Box 503 Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US Opponent's representative Dew, Melvyn John Esso Chemical Research Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxon OX13 6BB / GB | ||
02
18.01.1983
23.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative Van de Panne, Vitus Nicolaas Octrooibureau DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | |||
03
21.01.1983
23.03.1983
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Abt.: Patente/Lizenzen D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | 24.03.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.12.1983 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1984/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3256367 [ ] (JAYNE JR WILLIAM M); | GB1065568 [ ] (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | GB1154447 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | US3515775 [ ] (COMBS ROBERT LEONARD, et al); | DE2152746 [ ] (STAMICARBON); | DE2417093 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | CH594013 [ ] (STAMICARBON) |