EP0010122 - Device for tensioning the blanket on the transfer cylinder of a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.01.1985 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1985 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeschke, Willi Berghalde 68 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 79102339.3 | 09.07.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | DE19782842000 | 27.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2842000 | [1980/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0010122 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0010122 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010122 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/22, B41F27/12 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
B41F27/125 (EP,US);
B41F30/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/09] | B41F27/00, B41F27/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spannen des Gummituches auf dem Gummizylinder von Rotationsdruckmaschinen | [1980/09] | English: | Device for tensioning the blanket on the transfer cylinder of a rotary printing machine | [1980/09] | French: | Dispositif pour tendre le blanchet sur le cylindre de report d'une machine à imprimer rotative | [1980/09] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/16] | 15.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.1982
04.08.1982
ADMISSIBLE MAN ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung / FTB S Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | [1982/38] | 13.10.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1983 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 12.08.1983 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.08.1983 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1367860 (CRABTREE & SONS LTD R) |