EP0009105 - Plastic pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ziegel- und Kunststoffwerke Heinrich Oltmanns D-2905 Edewecht/Jeddeloh 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/07] | For all designated states Ziegel- und Kunststoffwerke Heinrich Oltmanns D-2905 Edewecht/Jeddeloh 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Granz, Axel Osterkampsweg 71a D-2900 Oldenburg / DE | 02 /
Oltmanns, Heinrich D-2905 Jeddeloh I / DE | [1980/07] | Representative(s) | Hauck, Hans, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing.H.Hauck, Dipl.-Phys.W.Schmitz, Dipl.-Ing.E.Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing.W.Wehnert, Dipl.-Phys.W.Carstens Dr.-Ing.W.Döring Neuer Wall 41 D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/07] | Hauck, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing.H.Hauck, Dipl.-Phys.W.Schmitz, Dipl.-Ing.E.Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing.W.Wehnert, Dipl.-Phys.W.Carstens Dr.-Ing.W.D ring Neuer Wall 41 D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79102768.3 | 02.08.1979 | [1980/07] | Priority number, date | DE19782840174 | 15.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2840174 | [1980/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009105 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009105 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/12, F16L9/18, E03F3/04 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
F16L57/00 (EP);
F16L9/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1980/07] | F16L9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, NL [1980/07] | Title | German: | Leitungsrohr aus Kunststoff | [1980/07] | English: | Plastic pipe | [1980/07] | French: | Conduite tubulaire en matière plastique | [1980/07] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/07] | 11.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 11.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1909468U [ ] (RHEIN PLASTIC ROHR G M B H [DE]); | DE6908040U [ ] (WAVIN BV [NL]); | DE1918099 [ ] (MONSANTO CO); | DE7007700U [ ] (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH [DE]); | GB1249566 [ ] (NORMALAIR GARRETT LTD); | GB1279498 [ ] (INDUTRIELE ONDERNEMING WAVIN N [NL]); | US4037626 [ ] (ROBERTS JR JAMES E) |