EP0011091 - Process for preparing alkyl- or arylthiomethyl-phenols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wedemeyer, Karlfried, Dr. Bilharzstrasse 7 D-5000 Köln / DE | 02 /
Fiege, Helmut, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 8 D-5090 Leverkusen-1 / DE | [1980/11] | Application number, filing date | 79102965.5 | 16.08.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | DE19782838273 | 01.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2838273 | [1980/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011091 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011091 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C148/00, C07C149/18, C07C149/36 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
C07C323/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkyl- bzw. Arylthiomethyl-phenolen | [1980/11] | English: | Process for preparing alkyl- or arylthiomethyl-phenols | [1980/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'alcoyl- ou d'arylthiométhyl-phénols | [1980/11] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1979 | Examination requested [1980/11] | 25.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.08.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1980 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1910588 [ ] | [ ] - THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 71, 1949Easton I.W. RUDERMAN et al. "A Condensation Reaction of Thiols with Phenol Alcohols" Seite 2264 * |