EP0010582 - Graft polyester products, method of sizing yarns therewith and a synthetic fiber sized with such graft polyester products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Wyandotte Corporation 1609 Biddle Avenue Wyandotte Michigan 48192 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states BASF WYANDOTTE CORPORATION 1609 Biddle Avenue Wyandotte Michigan 48192 / US | ||
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states BASF Wyandotte Corporation Wyandotte, Michigan 48192 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Login, Robert Bernard 22004 Orchard Drive Woodhaven, Michigan 48183 / US | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Bokelmann, Ekkehart c/o BASF Aktiengesellschaft 38 Carl-Bosch-Strasse D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Bokelmann, Ekkehart, Dr. c/o BASF Aktiengesellschaft 38 Carl-Bosch-Strasse D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103000.0 | 17.08.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | US19780937690 | 28.08.1978 Original published format: US 937690 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0010582 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0010582 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/00, D06M15/16, D06M10/00, D06L1/06 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
D06M14/18 (EP);
C08F299/0478 (EP);
D06L1/06 (EP);
D06M15/51 (EP);
D06M2200/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/10] | Title | German: | Pfropfpolyester-Produkte, Verfahren zum Schlichten von Garnen mit diesen Produkten und mit solchen Pfropfpolyesterprodukten geschlichteter synthetischer Faser | [1980/10] | English: | Graft polyester products, method of sizing yarns therewith and a synthetic fiber sized with such graft polyester products | [1980/10] | French: | Produits de polyesters greffés, méthode d'encollage de fils avec ceux-ci et fibre synthétique encollée avec de tels produits de polyesters greffés | [1980/10] | File destroyed: | 06.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 25.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 22.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3481890 [ ]; | FR1526580 [ ]; | US3655823 [ ]; | US2884404 [ ]; | US3011994 [ ] | [X] - RESARCH DISCLOSURE, vol. 158, June 1977, Havant, GB "Acrylic and methacrylic acid-grafted copolyesters as improved warp sizes for polyester filament yarns", page 39no. 15856. |