EP0024441 - Method and device for distributing liquids on grain cultures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.1983 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUHR-STICKSTOFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Königsallee 21 D-4630 Bochum 1 / DE | [1981/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merget, Norbert, Dr. Kulmerstrasse 12 D-4630 Bochum / DE | 02 /
Norden, Jürgen Samborner Strasse 97 D-4630 Bochum / DE | [1981/10] | Representative(s) | Oesker, Johanna, et al c/o Hüls Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung/PB 15 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | Steil, Hanna, Dipl.-Chem., et al c/o Hüls Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103080.2 | 22.08.1979 | [1981/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024441 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00, A01C21/00 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
A01M7/006 (EP);
B05B1/267 (EP);
B05B15/65 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1981/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von Flüssigkeiten auf Getreidekulturen | [1981/10] | English: | Method and device for distributing liquids on grain cultures | [1981/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour distribuer des liquides sur des cultures de céréales | [1981/10] | File destroyed: | 09.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 27.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1983 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2128877 [ ]; | US3143295 [ ] (BOOKER FINIS E); | FR1448201 [ ] (GOLDEN ARROW MFG LTD); | US3117725 [ ] (PALMER JOHN E); | US3147568 [ ] (INHOFER HAROLD G) |