EP0009134 - Rotary mower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/07] | Rotary disk mower | ||
[1982/14] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.11.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Zweigniederlassung Fahr D-7702 Gottmadingen / DE | [1980/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stelzle, Martin Sieblerstrasse 10 D-7702 Gottmadingen / DE | [1980/07] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/07] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103128.9 | 24.08.1979 | [1980/07] | Priority number, date | DE19782839841 | 13.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2839841 | [1980/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009134 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009134 | Date: | 07.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A01D35/264 | [1980/07] | CPC: |
A01D34/664 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/07] | Title | German: | Mähwerk | [1982/14] | English: | Rotary mower | [1982/14] | French: | Faucheuse | [1982/14] |
Former [1980/07] | Scheibenmähwerk | ||
Former [1980/07] | Rotary disk mower | ||
Former [1980/07] | Faucheuse à disques | Examination procedure | 14.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 15.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.12.1982
24.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. 10 Weverskade NL-3155 ZG Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Mulder, Herman, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.12.1982
24.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. 10 Weverskade NL-3155 ZG Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Mulder, Herman, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | 02.05.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.10.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1984 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.06.1985 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1986/04] | 25.07.1985 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1985/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/19] | CH | 07.04.1982 |