EP0013289 - Flat quench chamber for a load break switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1984 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concordia Sprecher GmbH Industriestrasse 9 D-70794 Filderstadt / DE | [1980/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perle, Josef Filsstrasse 7 D-7440 Nürt.-Zizishausen / DE | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/14] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys.Rotermund B.Sc. Morgan, Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/15] | Patentanwälte Manitz, Finsterwald und Grämkow Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103353.3 | 07.09.1979 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | DE19782856670 | 29.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2856670 | [1980/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013289 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013289 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/77, H01H33/12 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
H01H33/123 (EP);
H01H33/77 (EP);
H01H2033/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, SE [1980/15] | Title | German: | Flachlöschkammer für einen Lasttrennschalter | [1980/15] | English: | Flat quench chamber for a load break switch | [1980/15] | French: | Chambre d'extinction plate pour un sectionneur sous charge | [1980/15] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 03.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1053615 (CONCORDIA MASCH & ELEKT); | DE1094336 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | DE1129206 [ ] (MERLIN GERIN); | AT237728B [ ] (SIEMENS AG) | Examination | - BBC-Nachrichten, Juli 1963 S 366 - 371 |