EP0010598 - Locking arrangement for portable depository containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1984 [1984/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilovich, Paul Anthony 18701 Kosich Drive Saratoga California 95070 / US | 02 /
Lynott, John Joseph 38 Kimble Avenue Los Gatos California 95030 / US | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/10] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 79103403.6 | 12.09.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | US19780952436 | 18.10.1978 Original published format: US 952436 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010598 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010598 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/06, E05B73/00 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
G07D11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/10] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung für tragbare Deposito-Kassetten | [1980/10] | English: | Locking arrangement for portable depository containers | [1980/10] | French: | Dispositif d'immobilisation pour des cassettes à dépôt portables | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1980 | Examination requested [1981/06] | 15.06.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1955076 [ ] (NORDHAUSEN VEB FERNMELDEWERK); | DE2511063 [ ]; | US3773252 [ ] (JENSEN H); | US2604259 [ ] (BEEBE ANDERSON FLORENCE); | US3455503 [ ] (COFFIELD ROBERT); | CH458814 [ ] (NEWS AG [CH]); | DE322358 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | DE2410998 [ ] (RALFS GMBH) |