EP0009694 - Polyisocyanate for coatings based on modified 1-isocyanato-3,3,5 trimethyl-5 isocyanatomethyl cyclohexane, process for its preparation and its use in two-component polyurethane powder coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Eberhard, Dr. Gelber Weg 22 D-6242 Kronberg / DE | 02 /
Kreuder, Hans Joachim, Dr. Doerperhofstrasse 35 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 03 /
Breidenbach, Peter, Dr. Maarweg 33 D-5000 Köln 41 / DE | 04 /
Pedain, Josef, Dr. Haferkamp 6 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1980/08] | Application number, filing date | 79103462.2 | 17.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | DE19782842641 | 29.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2842641 | [1980/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009694 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009694 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.12.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/34, C08G18/80, C08G18/79, C09D3/72 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
C07D251/34 (EP,US);
C08G18/022 (EP);
C08G18/1875 (EP);
C08G18/2855 (EP);
C08G18/4213 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08G18/8061 (US);
C08G18/8074 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Lackpolyisocyanat auf Basis von modifiziertem 1-Isocyanato-3,3,5-trimethyl-5-isocyanatomethyl-cyclohexan, ein Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung in Zweikomponenten-Polyurethan-Pulverlacken | [1980/08] | English: | Polyisocyanate for coatings based on modified 1-isocyanato-3,3,5 trimethyl-5 isocyanatomethyl cyclohexane, process for its preparation and its use in two-component polyurethane powder coatings | [1980/08] | French: | Polyisocyanate pour revêtements à base du 1-isocyanate-3,3,5 triméthyl-5 isocyanatométhylcyclohexane modifié, un procédé pour sa préparation et son application dans des revêtements en poudre de polyuréthane à deux composants | [1980/08] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1979 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 27.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1455546 [ ] (ICI LTD); | FR2381810 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | DE2712931 [ ] (VEBA CHEMIE AG) |