EP0009701 - Sulfur-containing reaction products, method for their preparation and their use as lubricant additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHEIN-CHEMIE RHEINAU GmbH Düsseldorfer Strasse 23-27 68219 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/08] | For all designated states RHEIN-CHEMIE RHEINAU GmbH Düsseldorfer Strasse 23-27 D-68219 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreutzer, Ingo In den Seegärten 11 D-6836 Oftersheim / DE | 02 /
Schüle, Wolfgang Egerlandweg 5 D-6834 Ketsch / DE | 03 /
Krüger, Wolfgang, Dr. Memelweg 5 D-6830 Schwetzingen / DE | 04 /
Wilken, Ortrud Stamitzstrasse 2 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | [1980/08] | Representative(s) | Gremm, Joachim, Dr., et al Bayer AG c/o Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-5090 Leverkusen 1, Bayerwerk / DE | [1981/06] |
Former [1980/08] | Gremm, Joachim, Dr. Bayer AG c/o Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103472.1 | 17.09.1979 | [1980/08] | Priority number, date | DE19782842138 | 28.09.1978 Original published format: DE 2842138 | [1980/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009701 | Date: | 16.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009701 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C148/00, C10M1/38 | [1980/08] | CPC: |
C10M135/02 (EP);
C07G99/002 (EP);
C10M2219/022 (EP);
C10M2219/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/08] | Title | German: | Schwefelhaltige Umsetzungsprodukte, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verwendung als Zusatz zu Schmiermitteln | [1980/08] | English: | Sulfur-containing reaction products, method for their preparation and their use as lubricant additives | [1980/08] | French: | Produits de réaction contenant du soufre, procédé pour leur préparation et leur application comme additifs dans des lubrifiants | [1980/08] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1979 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 17.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 13.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE140827 [ ]; | FR2176679 [ ] (ELCO CORP [US]); | US3850825 [ ] (VIENNA P, et al) |