EP0010214 - Control device for regulation transformers employed especially in electric toy- or model railways [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/09] | Regulation transformer for electric toy railways | ||
[1982/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bradt, Peter Bachstrasse 10 D-2875 Ganderkesee / DE | [1980/09] | Application number, filing date | 79103736.9 | 01.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | DE19780030650U | 14.10.1978 Original published format: DE 7830650 U | [1980/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010214 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010214 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A63H19/24, H01F29/06, H01H19/10, H01H85/08, H05K1/00 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
H05K1/189 (EP);
A63H19/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Stelleinrichtung für Netzanschlussgeräte, insbesondere für elektrische Spielzeug- und Modelleisenbahnen | [1982/15] | English: | Control device for regulation transformers employed especially in electric toy- or model railways | [1982/15] | French: | Dispositif de réglage pour transformateur réglage, notamment pour trains miniatures électriques | [1982/15] |
Former [1980/09] | Stelltransformator für elektrische Spielzeug- und Modelleisenbahnen | ||
Former [1980/09] | Regulation transformer for electric toy railways | ||
Former [1980/09] | Transformateur de réglage pour trains miniatures électriques | Examination procedure | 27.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 16.12.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE7503470U [ ]; | AT324470B [ ] (GOSSEN GMBH [DE]); | GB1476885 [ ] (LICHTBLAU G); | DE2703255 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | DE2734994 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | DE2813774 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) | [ ] - SIEMENS-ZEITSCHRIFT, Band 50, Heft 11, 1976 H. HADERSBECK et al. "Grossformatigeflexible gedruckte Verdrahtungen in Geraten der Nachrichtentechnik" Seiten 723 bis 726 |