EP0011136 - Integrity protection circuitry for read-/write control storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.1982 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallagher, Joseph Gerard R.D. 3, Box 123A Owego, New York 13827 / US | 02 /
Plant, James Walter 1024 Holly Lane Endwell, New York 13760 / US | [1980/11] | Representative(s) | Rudolph, Wolfgang Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/11] | Rudolph, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 79103922.5 | 12.10.1979 | [1980/11] | Priority number, date | US19780959824 | 13.11.1978 Original published format: US 959824 | [1980/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011136 | Date: | 28.05.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G11C7/00 | [1980/11] | CPC: |
G06F12/1425 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/11] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Integritätsschutz für einen Lese-/Schreib-Steuerspeicher | [1980/11] | English: | Integrity protection circuitry for read-/write control storage | [1980/11] | French: | Circuit pour la protection de l'intégrité d'une mémoire de commande de lecture et d'écriture | [1980/11] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 22.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 26.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/19] | 24.12.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1774863 [ ]; | DE2639557 [ ]; | US3108257 [ ]; | DE2749710 [ ]; | DD98383 [ ]; | US3599159 [ ] |