EP0010291 - Switch cabinet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg D-35745 Herborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andreas, Hugo D-6342 Haiger-Weidelbach / DE | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Auenweg 14 D-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | [1980/09] | Application number, filing date | 79103991.0 | 16.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | DE19782846155 | 24.10.1978 Original published format: DE 2846155 | [1980/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010291 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010291 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/08 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
H02B1/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/09] | Title | German: | Schaltschrank | [1980/09] | English: | Switch cabinet | [1980/09] | French: | Armoire électrique | [1980/09] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/13] | 10.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.10.1982 | IT | 27.10.1982 | NL | 27.10.1982 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 27.10.1982 | |
IT | 27.10.1982 | ||
NL | 27.10.1982 | ||
Former [1983/43] | BE | 27.10.1982 | |
NL | 27.10.1982 | ||
Former [1983/18] | BE | 27.10.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | US2808309 [ ] (MAGESTER EARL H); | FR1496775 [ ]; | FR1575650 [ ]; | FR2333407 [ ] (DENIZET RENE [FR]) |