EP0015318 - Method of producing pure alpha,omega-C6 to C20 alkenols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMISCHE WERKE HÜLS AG Postfach 1320 D-4370 Marl 1 / DE | [1980/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufhold, Manfred, Dr. Bitterfelder Strasse 7a D-4370 Marl / DE | 02 /
Jacquemin, Werner, Dr. Stockwieser Kamp 12 D-4358 Haltern / DE | [1980/19] | Application number, filing date | 79105031.3 | 10.12.1979 | [1980/19] | Priority number, date | DE19792904518 | 07.02.1979 Original published format: DE 2904518 | [1980/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015318 | Date: | 17.09.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015318 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C33/025, C07C29/60 | [1980/19] | CPC: |
C07C29/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/60, C07C33/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von reinen alpha,omega-C6-bis C20-Alkenolen | [1980/19] | English: | Method of producing pure alpha,omega-C6 to C20 alkenols | [1980/19] | French: | Procédé de synthèse d'alpha,oméga-C6 à C20-alcénols purs | [1980/19] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1980 | Examination requested [1980/19] | 17.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SU491627 [ ]; | GB1355704 [ ] (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE); | FR2262005 [ ] (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]); | US2086713 [ ] (ADOLF GRUN); | USRE19194E [ ]; | GB1355705 [ ] (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 85, Nr. 7, 16. August 1976, Seite 471, Nr. 45897u Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. L. TOKARZEWSKI et al.: "Studies on the catalytic dehydration of hexamethylene glycol" & CHEM. STOSOW. 1975, 19(4)501-10. * Zusammenfassung * |