EP0013384 - Grip for the fitting of elements, in particular furniture elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.1983 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.1984 [1984/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lauterbach, Heinrich Graudenzer Strasse 18 a D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1980/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Merten, Fritz Tristanstrasse 5 90461 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | Merten, Fritz Tristanstrasse 5 D-90461 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 79105245.9 | 18.12.1979 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | DE19782856174 | 27.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2856174 | [1980/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0013384 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0013384 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A47B95/02 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
A47B95/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, GB, SE [1980/15] | Title | German: | Griff zum Beschlagen von Teilen, insbesondere Möbelteilen | [1980/15] | English: | Grip for the fitting of elements, in particular furniture elements | [1980/15] | French: | Poignée pour la garniture d'éléments, en particulier d'éléments de meubles | [1980/15] | File destroyed: | 06.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/36] | 06.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/08] | 20.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.03.1980 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   17.03.1980 | 17.03.1980 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   17.03.1980 | 17.03.1980 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   17.03.1980 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.1982 | 31.12.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB768255 [ ]; | US2849749 [ ]; | FR1179141 [ ]; | US3075735 [ ]; | DE1457204 [ ]; | GB860731 [ ] |