EP0013023 - Method of milling cereal and cereal milling plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG Bahnhofstrasse 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states Gebrüder Bühler AG CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mächler, Ernst Rosenstrasse 9 CH-9524 Zuzwil / CH | 02 /
Kummer, Emanuel Bachstrasse 40 CH-9292 Gossau / CH | 03 /
Baltensperger, Werner Weingarten 11 CH-9242 Oberuzwil / CH | [1980/14] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1980/14] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER, Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79105351.5 | 22.12.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | DE19782855715 | 22.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2855715 | [1980/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013023 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013023 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B02C9/04 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
B02C9/04 (EP,US);
B02C25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1980/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vermahlung von Getreide und Getreidemühlenanlage | [1980/14] | English: | Method of milling cereal and cereal milling plant | [1980/14] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la mouture de céréales | [1980/14] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 23.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.04.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.10.1982 | NL | 20.10.1982 | [1983/43] |
Former [1983/17] | BE | 20.10.1982 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2413956 [ ] (SIMON LTD HENRY) |