EP0016870 - Process for polymerising methylmethacrylate, lamina produced from this polymer and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.06.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | [1980/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosch, Ludwig Grüner Weg 34 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1980/21] | Application number, filing date | 79105366.3 | 24.12.1979 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792913853 | 06.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2913853 | [1980/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016870 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016870 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0016870 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/44, C08F20/18, C08K5/34, A61N5/06 | [1982/16] | CPC: |
C08F20/14 (EP,US);
C08F2/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/21] | C08F2/44, C08F20/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1980/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Polymerisieren von Methylmethacrylat sowie aus diesem Polymerisat hergestellte Platte und Verwendung derselben | [1980/21] | English: | Process for polymerising methylmethacrylate, lamina produced from this polymer and its use | [1980/21] | French: | Procédé pour la polymérisation de méthacrylate de méthyle, plaque préparée à partir de ce polymère et son utilisation | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 13.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.10.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | Appeal received No. T112/85 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.1983
23.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE CIBA-GEIGY AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponents representative Zumstein sen., Fritz, et al, et al Dr. F. Zumstein sen. Dr. E. Assmann Dr. R. Koenigsberger Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Dr. F. Zumstein jun. Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.1983
23.02.1983
ADMISSIBLE CIBA-GEIGY AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponents representative Zumstein, Fritz sen., Dr., et al, et al Dr. F. Zumstein sen. Dr. E. Assmann Dr. R. Koenigsberger Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Dr. F. Zumstein jun. Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | 24.02.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.06.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.01.1984 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.1984 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.01.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.04.1985 | Appeal received No. T0112/85 | 23.04.1986 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/17] | 24.06.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP50058141 ; | [AD]DE2417535 (CIBA GEIGY AG) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 83, No. 22, 1. December 1975, Seite 55, Zusammenfassung 180327g. Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP-A-50 058 141 (SANKYO CO. LTD.) (20-05-1975), & JP50058141 A 00000000 |