EP0003378 - Process for the manufacture of partially esterified and partially saponified reaction products from natural resin acids and dicarboxylic acids and their application to printing inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.04.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 80 03 20 D-65926 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1980/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 64 D-65929 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rudolphy, Albert Wilhelm-Kalle-Strasse 20 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Biebrich / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79200029.1 | 17.01.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782802702 | 23.01.1978 Original published format: DE 2802702 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003378 | Date: | 08.08.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003378 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0003378 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C09F1/04, C09D11/08, C08F8/00 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
C09F1/04 (EP,US);
C09D11/08 (EP,US);
Y10S260/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/46] | C09F1/04, C09D11/10, C08F8/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von teilveresterten und teilversalzten Umsetzungsprodukten von Naturharzsäuren und Dicarbonsäureeinheiten und deren Verwendung in Druckfarben | English: | Process for the manufacture of partially esterified and partially saponified reaction products from natural resin acids and dicarboxylic acids and their application to printing inks | French: | Procédé de préparation de produits de réaction partiellement estérifiés et partiellement salifiés d'acides résiniques naturels et de composés dicarboxyliques et leur utilisation dans les couleurs d'impression | Examination procedure | 05.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 05.08.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1982
17.09.1982
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 / Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al, et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1982
17.09.1982
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis R., et al, et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1986/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1982
17.09.1982
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1 NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland, et al, et al OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1983/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1982
17.09.1982
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1 NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Leherte, Georges Maurice Lucien Marie Octrooibureau DSM P.O.Box 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1983/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1982
17.09.1982
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1 NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative van Leeuwen, Hendrik Bernardus Octrooibureau DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [1982/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.1982
Unilever N.V. Burgemeester's Jacobplein 1 NL-3015 CA Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Wiesenhaan, Herman, Drs. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O.Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | 10.09.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.03.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.03.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1983 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.02.1986 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2161908 [ ] (REICHHOLD ALBERT CHEMIE AG); | US2380192 [ ] (SCHLAANSTINE RAYMOND F) |