EP0004123 - Folding box and a blank therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/25] | Folding box | ||
[1982/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brdr. Schur International A/S J.W. Schursvej D-8700 Horsens / DK | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambach, Heinrich Wilhelm Bjerrevej 127 8700 Horsens / DK | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 79200125.7 | 12.03.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780009601 | 10.03.1978 Original published format: GB 960178 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004123 | Date: | 19.09.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004123 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/54 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
B65D5/548 (EP,US);
B65D5/541 (EP,US);
B65D5/545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Faltschachtel und Zuschnitt dafür | [1982/25] | English: | Folding box and a blank therefor | [1982/25] | French: | Boîte pliante et flan correspondant | [1982/25] |
Former [1982/25] | Faltschachtel | ||
Former [1982/25] | Folding box | ||
Former [1982/25] | Boîte pliante | Examination procedure | 13.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 28.07.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1980 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.06.1982 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | US1502606 [ ] (WHELAN FRANK J); | US2368534 [ ] (FORRER HOMER W); | FR1229030 [ ] (CARTONNERIE & IMPRIMERIE SAINT); | CH434097 [ ] (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]); | FR1501985 [ ] (CARTONNERIES DE SAINT GERMAIN); | FR1532501 [ ] |