EP0004695 - A transportable installation for mixing concrete [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1980 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Mulder's Fabriek van Rollend Materieel Parklaan 4 NL-2771 GB Boskoop / NL | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lagendijk, Johan Abraham Kroesweg 1 NL-2042 KV Waddinxveen / NL | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Davidson, Cornelis M.R., et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.P. 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79200177.8 | 10.04.1979 | Priority number, date | NL19780003801 | 11.04.1978 Original published format: NL 7803801 | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004695 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004695 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B28C9/04 | CPC: |
B28C9/0445 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Transportabele Betonbereitungsanlage | English: | A transportable installation for mixing concrete | French: | Installation mobile pour la préparation de béton | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 02.06.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1980/23] | 12.08.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | BE661674 [ ]; | NL7604126 [ ]; | CH423589 [ ]; | FR1459275 [ ]; | DE1114422 [ ] |