EP0010798 - A process for producing a proteinaceous foodstuff with a fibrous structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1980/12] | For:AT
BE
DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1980/10] | For:AT
BE
DE
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. P.O. Box 760 NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever Limited Unilever House, Blackfriars P.O.Box 68 London E.C.4 / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westdorp, Pieter Deceased NL-6941 AM Didam / NL | 02 /
Walraven, Robert Marinus Wilhelm Rembrandtstraat 6 NL-6921 BA Duiven / NL | [1980/10] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Susan Margaret, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Thomas, Susan Margaret, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1980/23] | Fransella, Mary Evelyn Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1980/10] | Léon, Alain Elie, Dr. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 79200580.3 | 11.10.1979 | [1980/10] | Priority number, date | NL19780010505 | 20.10.1978 Original published format: NL 7810505 | [1980/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010798 | Date: | 14.05.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010798 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/00 | [1980/10] | CPC: |
A23J3/227 (EP);
A23J3/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines proteinhaltigen Nahrungsmittels mit faserförmiger Struktur | [1980/10] | English: | A process for producing a proteinaceous foodstuff with a fibrous structure | [1980/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un produit alimentaire protéinique ayant une structure fibreuse | [1980/10] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1980 | Examination requested [1980/12] | 11.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1505075 [ ] (RALSTON PURINA CO); | GB1105904 [ ] (RALSTON PURINA CO); | US3488770 [ ] (ATKINSON WILLIAM T); | FR2048855 [ ] (RALSTON PURINA CO); | FR2048462 [ ] (RALSTON PURINA CO); | US3845228 [ ] (ATKINSON W); | GB1400411 [ ] (UNILEVER LTD); | GB1412801 [ ] (RALSTON PURINA CO); | US3953611 [ ] (YOUNGQUIST RUDOLPH WILLIAM); | US3968268 [ ] (SAIR LOUIS, et al); | US4000323 [ ] (YOUNGQUIST RUDOLPH WILLIAM); | FR2321245 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |