EP0011903 - Hydraulic pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLETCHER, SUTCLIFFE, WILD LIMITED Universal Works Horbury Wakefield West Yorkshire WF4 5HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states FLETCHER, SUTCLIFFE, WILD LIMITED Universal Works Horbury Wakefield West Yorkshire WF4 5HR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foster, Malcolm Cyril 37,-Wavell Grove Sandal Wakefield Yorkshire / GB | [1980/12] | Representative(s) | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 79200693.4 | 27.11.1979 | [1980/12] | Priority number, date | GB19460037178 | 28.11.1978 Original published format: GB 4637178 | [1980/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011903 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011903 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1980 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/16, F04B21/08 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
F04B53/164 (EP,US);
F16J15/006 (EP,US);
Y10S277/946 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/12] | F04B21/08, F16J15/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/12] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Pumpe | [1980/12] | English: | Hydraulic pump | [1980/12] | French: | Pompe hydraulique | [1980/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.08.1980 | Examination requested [1980/23] | 17.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.09.1981 | NL | 30.09.1981 | SE | 30.09.1981 | LU | 30.11.1981 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.09.1981 | |
NL | 30.09.1981 | ||
SE | 30.09.1981 | ||
Former [1982/31] | NL | 30.09.1981 | |
SE | 30.09.1981 | ||
Former [1982/19] | NL | 30.09.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2103971 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US3849032 [ ] (MULVEY P, et al); | FR2266010 [ ] (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]); | DE2336147 [ ] (WEPUKO HYDRAULIK GMBH); | US3785659 [ ] (MAURER W, et al); | US2815970 [ ] (WALLACE EUGENE E); | DE451385 [ ] (WILHELM GROETZINGER); | FR1170338 [ ] (RECH ETUDES PRODUCTION SARL) |