EP0028272 - Method and device for the transmission of enciphered information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patelhold Patentverwertungs- & Elektro-Holding AG Bankstrasse 21 8750 Glarus / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | For all designated states PATELHOLD Patentverwertungs- & Elektro-Holding AG Glarus / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldinger, Hans Albisriederstrasse158 CH-8003 Zürich / CH | [1981/19] | Application number, filing date | 79200709.8 | 03.12.1979 | [1981/19] | Priority number, date | CH19790009860 | 03.11.1979 Original published format: CH 986079 | [1981/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028272 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/02 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
H04L9/12 (EP);
H04L9/0656 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1981/28] |
Former [1981/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur verschlüsselten Nachrichtenübertragung | [1981/19] | English: | Method and device for the transmission of enciphered information | [1981/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la transmission chiffrée d'informations | [1981/19] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, GB, LU | 13.04.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.02.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/29] | 16.04.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.1980 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.11.1980 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 03.11.1980 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 03.11.1980 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.11.1981 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2288428 [ ]; | GB1566442 [ ]; | DE1549067 [ ]; | US3740475 [ ] |