EP0014276 - Integrated sewage treatment system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1985 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.1985 [1985/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nealy, Robert H. 365-C11 Newtown Road Warminster Pennsylvania 18974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/17] | For all designated states Nealy, Robert H. 365-C11 Newtown Road Warminster Pennsylvania 18974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Wallner, Gerhard Juchgasse 40/23 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/23] | Wallner, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Juchgasse 40/23 A-1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1983/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1982/36] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 Munchen 60 / DE | ||
Former [1982/25] | Wilson, Joseph Martin WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1980/17] | Wilson, Joseph Martin WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300051.4 | 12.01.1979 | [1980/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0014276 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/00, C02F11/00, F23G3/00, F24D11/00 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
F24D11/005 (EP);
C02F1/02 (EP);
F23G7/001 (EP);
C02F2103/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/15] |
Former [1980/17] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Integrales System für Abwasserbehandlung | [1980/17] | English: | Integrated sewage treatment system | [1980/17] | French: | Système intégral pour le traitement d'eaux usées | [1980/17] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1980 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, IT, NL | 25.06.1980 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 12.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1985/51] | 06.09.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/51] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.1982 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.1982 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.1983 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.01.1980 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.01.1980 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 14.01.1980 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 14.01.1980 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 14.01.1980 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 14.01.1980 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.1982 | 31.01.1983 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 19.10.1982 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal incapacity of representative | Documents cited: | Search | US3522613 [ ]; | US3850801 [ ]; | DE1404862 [ ]; | US3533364 [ ]; | AU4014772 [ ]; | DE330466 [ ]; | FR2246502 [ ]; | FR400337 [ ]; | US4053399 [ ] (DONNELLY LAWRENCE A, et al); | US3546713 [ ]; | FR2308063 [ ] |