EP0013466 - Temperature monitoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/15] | Transducers | ||
[1983/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spill-Fire Alarm Systems Limited High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6RE / GB | [1980/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norfolk, Raymond Walter 63 Sheepwalk Lane Townville Castleford, Yorkshire / GB | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Funge, Harry, et al M'CAW & CO. 41-51 Royal Exchange Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | [1980/15] | Application number, filing date | 79300059.7 | 15.01.1979 | [1980/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013466 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013466 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/26, G01M3/16, G01K7/34, H01C10/02 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
G01F23/246 (EP);
G01K7/26 (EP);
G01K7/343 (EP);
G01M3/002 (EP);
G01M3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1980/15] | Title | German: | Temperaturüberwachungsgerät | [1983/22] | English: | Temperature monitoring device | [1983/22] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de température | [1983/22] |
Former [1980/15] | Wandler | ||
Former [1980/15] | Transducers | ||
Former [1980/15] | Transducteurs | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 15.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2323213 [ ]; | US3089337 [ ]; | DE1931361 [ ]; | DE1134532 [ ]; | DE662719 [ ]; | US2375892 [ ]; | US2548763 [ ]; | US3938385 [ ] | Examination | - Fachlexikon ABC Chemie 2.Auflage, 1979, Band 2, pages 237 and 1047 |