EP0003412 - Electric delay device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1979 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirby, Ian John PO BOX No. 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | 02 /
Mitchell, Michael Ian PO Box No. 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | 03 /
Stratton, Andrew Imperial Chemical House Millbank London SW1P 3QG / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Reid, Thomas James, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79300087.8 | 18.01.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780004057 | 01.02.1978 Original published format: GB 405778 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0003412 | Date: | 08.08.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0003412 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | F42C1/06, G01V1/08, H03K5/13, H03K5/15, G04C23/46 | CPC: |
H03K5/131 (EP,US);
F42B3/122 (EP,US);
F42D1/055 (EP,US);
G01V1/08 (EP,US);
G04F1/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisches Verzögerungsgerät | English: | Electric delay device | French: | Dispositif de délai électrique | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.09.1979 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.162(4) [1980/01] | 28.09.1979 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/01] | 28.09.1979 | Request for conversion into a national application, for DE/FR/SE [1980/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1067931 (PEDER WERNER); | US3739199 [ ] (NEGROU J); | US3953804 [ ] (DETHLEFSEN HANS, et al); | [A]FR2333220 (MEFINA SA [CH]); | [X]GB1493104 (FERRANTI LTD) |