EP0004715 - Tire building machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1980 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NRM Corporation P.O. Box 6338 3200 Gilchrist Road Akron, Ohio 44312 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states NRM CORPORATION P.O. Box 6338 3200 Gilchrist Road Akron, Ohio 44312 / US | ||
Former [1980/12] | For all designated states NRM CORPORATION 400 W. Railroad Street Columbiana Ohio 44408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enders, George E. 15100 Salem-Alliance Road Salem Ohio 44460 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Rooney, Paul Blaise, et al D.Young & Co. 10 Staple Inn London WC1V 7RD / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 79300393.0 | 13.03.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780886742 | 15.03.1978 Original published format: US 886742 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0004715 | Date: | 17.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B29H17/22 | CPC: |
B29D30/36 (EP,US);
B29D30/245 (EP,US);
B29D30/32 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3214 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3228 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Reifenaufbaumaschine | English: | Tire building machine | French: | Machine de confection des pneumatiques | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1980 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1980/23] | 31.07.1980 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1980/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2738566 [ ] (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | FR1446490 [ ] (DUNLOP SA); | FR2315383 [ ] (UNIROYAL INC [US]); | DE1263287 [ ] (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | FR1366516 [ ] (DUNLOP SA); | DE1262583 [ ] (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) |