EP0004449 - Bonding process for grinding tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fletcher, J. Lawrence 3102 South Pacific Santa Ana California 92704 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | Walters, Frederick James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300429.2 | 19.03.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780888081 | 20.03.1978 Original published format: US 888081 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0004449 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0004449 | Date: | 03.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0004449 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C25D15/00, B24D3/06 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
B24D18/0018 (EP);
C25D15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Bindungsverfahren für Schleifwerkzeuge | English: | Bonding process for grinding tools | French: | Procédé de fixation pour outils abrasifs | Examination procedure | 16.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/10] | 17.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1311854 [ ]; | FR2075972 [ ]; | GB966604 [ ]; | DE752952 [ ]; | US3957593 [ ]; | US3356599 [ ]; | US4079552 [ ]; | US2360798 [ ]; | FR1147811 [ ]; | FR2134846 [ ]; | US3973925 [ ] |