EP0005024 - Stilt material protecting pressure-sensitive microcapsules against premature rupture, sheet material coated with microcapsules protected by this stilt material, and method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.10.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLETON PAPERS INC. P.O. Box 359 825 East Wisconsin Avenue Appleton Wisconsin 54912 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myers, Hugh Kirby 2632 South Carpenter Appleton Wisconsin 54911 / US | 02 /
Hayford, Donald Edward 512 East Parkway Boulevard Appleton Wisconsin 54911 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1984/25] | Norris, Richard John The Wiggins Teape Group Limited Group Patents Department Butler's Court Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 1RT / GB | ||
Former [1984/25] | Farwell, William Robert PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300587.7 | 10.04.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780899847 | 25.04.1978 Original published format: US 899847 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005024 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, C08L5/00, B01J13/00 | CPC: |
B41M5/1243 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2984 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2987 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Gerüstsubstanz zum Schützen von druckempfindlichen Mikrokapseln vor vorzeitigem Bruch, blattförmiges Material mit einer Mikrokapsel-Schicht in der die Mikrokapseln mittels dieser Gerüstsubstanz geschützt sind, und Verfahren zur Herstellung | English: | Stilt material protecting pressure-sensitive microcapsules against premature rupture, sheet material coated with microcapsules protected by this stilt material, and method of production | French: | Matériau de renforcement protégeant des microcapsules sensibles à la pression contre la rupture prématurée, matériau sous forme de feuille portant une couche de microcapsules protégées par ce matériau de renforcement, et méthode de production | Examination procedure | 08.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/08] | 12.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/51] | 18.10.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/51] | Appeal following examination | 29.04.1982 | Appeal received No. T0117/82 | 16.07.1982 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.02.1983 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1983/07] | 30.03.1983 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1983/14] | 14.07.1983 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1983/29] | 08.09.1983 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1983/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4046404 [ ] (TREIER GEORGE); | US3481759 [ ] (OSTLIE DEAN A); | US3930101 [ ] (VINCENT DAVID N); | FR2170687 [ ] (WIGGINS TEAPE RES DEV [GB]); | US2655453 [ ] (SANDBERG ROBERT W); | US3844816 [ ] (VASSILIADES A, et al); | US3839064 [ ] (VINCENT D); | US3743604 [ ] (SCHNORING H, et al) |