EP0005026 - Installation for casting ceramic sanitaryware articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.05.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1985 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH Postfach 18 09, Euskirchener Strasse 80 D-53008 Bonn / DE | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moore, Bernard Clive Avenue Lorette 4 B-1328 Ohain / BE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/26] | Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300593.5 | 10.04.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780015053 | 17.04.1978 Original published format: GB 1505378 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005026 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005026 | Date: | 30.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/26 | [1982/26] | CPC: |
B28B1/267 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Giessen von keramischen Sanitärgegenständen | English: | Installation for casting ceramic sanitaryware articles | French: | Installation pour le moulage d'articles sanitaires en céramique | Examination procedure | 28.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/15] | 03.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.1983
27.04.1983
ADMISSIBLE VILLEROY & BOCH KERAMISCHE WERKE KG D-6642 Mettlach/Saar / DE Opponent's representative Bernhardt, Winfrid Patentanwälte Bernhardt Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.03.1983
27.04.1983
ADMISSIBLE VILLEROY & BOCH KERAMISCHE WERKE KG D-6642 Mettlach/Saar / DE Opponent's representative Bernhardt, Winfrid, Dr.-Ing. Kobenhüttenweg 43 D-66123 Saarbrücken / DE | 27.04.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.08.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.1983 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 11.02.1985 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.02.1985 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1985/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2583842 [ ]; | GB1140282 [ ]; | DE2444551 [ ]; | FR2210135 [ ] |