EP0017681 - Method for removing chromium ions from aqueous solutions of organic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1984 [1984/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshioka, Teruhiko No. 6-17, 7-chome Kuba Otake City Hiroshima Pref. / JP | 02 /
Matsuzawa, Hideo No. 10-4, 2-chome Nishisakae Otake City Hiroshima Pref. / JP | 03 /
Okada, Kazuya No. 2-3, 3-chome Kurokawa Otake City Hiroshima Pref. / JP | 04 /
Ikeda, Minoru No. 908-224, Ono-cho Saiki-gun Hiroshima Pref. / JP | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Warden, John Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 12-15, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Warden, John Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 12-15, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300619.8 | 12.04.1979 | [1980/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017681 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017681 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C53/02, C07C53/08, C07C53/122, C07C57/04, C07C51/47 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
C07C51/47 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/47, C07C53/02 (EP);
C07C51/47, C07C53/08 (EP);
C07C51/47, C07C53/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1980/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Chrom-Ionen aus wässrigen Lösungen organischer Säuren | [1980/22] | English: | Method for removing chromium ions from aqueous solutions of organic acids | [1980/22] | French: | Procédé de séparation des ions de chrome de solutions aqueuses d'acides organiques | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/41] | 12.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1290212 [ ] | Examination | - Chemical Handbook of the Japanese Chemical Association (1975), pp. 1629-1630 |