EP0005054 - Process for the preparation of iron oxide and compositions containing iron oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINERAL PROCESS LICENSING CORPORATION BV 62, Lange Voorhout NL-2514 EH The Hague / NL | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shackleton, Charles Edward Ernest Deceased London S.W.L. / GB | 02 /
Turner, John Harry Wallice Cornerstones Cockyard Chapel-en-le-Frith v. Stockport Cheshire / GB | [1982/17] |
Former [1982/17] | 01 /
Shackleton, Charles Edward Ernest 47A Lower Belgrave Street London S.W.L. / GB | ||
02 /
Turner, John Harry Wallice Cornerstones Cockyard Chapel-en-le-Frith v. Stockport Cheshire / GB | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 79300644.6 | 19.04.1979 | Priority number, date | GB19780015845 | 21.04.1978 Original published format: GB 1584578 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0005054 | Date: | 31.10.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0005054 | Date: | Status: | (deleted) | [N/P] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/06, C09C1/24, C08K7/08 | CPC: |
C09C1/245 (EP,US);
C01G49/06 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/10 (EP);
C01P2006/11 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/19 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L95/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Eisenoxid und Eisenoxid enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | English: | Process for the preparation of iron oxide and compositions containing iron oxide | French: | Procédé de préparation d'oxyde de fer et compositions contenant l'oxyde de fer | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 22.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS5034000 [ ]; | US2852339 [ ] (HILL CYRIL T); | DE2526214 [ ] (LANGMATZ HANS); | DE2629934 [ ] (LAPORTE INDUSTRIES LTD); | FR2344496 [ ] (KRONOS TITAN GMBH [DE]); | US4055621 [ ] (OKUDAIRA SHIGENORI, et al); | DE2751434 [ ] (MINERAL PROCESS LICENSING CORP); | FR2371378 [ ] (MINERAL PROCESS LICENSING CORP [NL]); | US4140746 [ ] (TURNER JOHN H W, et al) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 83, 1975, abstract 45369g Columbus, Ohio, USA M. TAKAHASHI et al. "Growth of alpha-ferric oxide crystals"page 115; & JP-A-50 034 000 (TEIKOKU KAKO LTD.). * Complete abstract * |